Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/29/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/19/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/29/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/20/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/20/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/20/2004