Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/17/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/17/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/23/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/30/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/30/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/30/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/30/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/30/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/01/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/01/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/01/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/01/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/07/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/21/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/28/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/04/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/04/2003