Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/17/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/15/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/16/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/20/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/20/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/21/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/28/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/05/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/29/2004