Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/08/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/27/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/19/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/08/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/13/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/21/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/22/2004