Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/20/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/20/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/26/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/25/2004