Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/06/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/06/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/06/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/06/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/20/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/20/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/21/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/21/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/25/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/16/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/04/2004