Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/30/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/25/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/25/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/25/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/30/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/13/2004