Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/19/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/19/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 11/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/29/2004