There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that the President should seek to enter into a free trade agreement with the United Kingdom.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/19/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
11/20/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2359)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2003Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/08/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/19/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade11/24/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.331.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.331. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2003)

States that the President should seek to enter into a free trade agreement with the United Kingdom.