Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/02/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/02/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/02/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/02/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/02/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/02/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/02/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/03/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/09/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/22/2004