Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/17/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/24/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/02/2004