Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/01/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/01/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/01/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/01/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/01/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/01/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/01/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/01/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/01/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/01/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/02/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/11/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/17/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/17/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/18/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/18/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/18/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/24/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/24/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/24/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/25/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/29/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/29/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/29/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/29/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/31/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/31/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/27/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/18/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/01/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/01/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/13/2004