Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/01/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/01/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/16/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/23/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/23/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/23/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/23/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/25/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/30/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/13/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/03/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/03/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/03/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/18/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/24/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/21/2004