There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling on the Government of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam to immediately and unconditionally release Father Thaddeus Nguyen Van Ly, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/12/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 167).(text as passed House: CR 5/11/2004 H2761)
03/04/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
05/13/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/12/2004-6:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/12/2004-6:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 167). (text as passed House: CR 5/11/2004 H2761)
05/12/2004-6:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2874-2875)
05/11/2004-4:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2004-4:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 378.
05/11/2004-4:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2761-2765)
05/11/2004-4:24pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/31/2004HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
03/04/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
03/04/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/24/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/25/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/30/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/30/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/30/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/31/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/31/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/01/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/12/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/12/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations03/04/2004 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations05/13/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/12/2004)

States that Congress: (1) condemns the detention of Father Thaddeus Nguyen Van Ly by the Government of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam and calls for his immediate and unconditional release; (2) condemns the violations of freedom of speech, religion, movement, association, and the lack of due process afforded to individuals in Vietnam; (3) urges the Government of Vietnam to consider the implications of its actions for the broader relationship with the United States, including the United States-Vietnam Bilateral Trade Agreement; (4) urges the Government of Vietnam to allow unfettered access to the Central Highlands by foreign diplomats, the international press, and nongovernmental organizations; and (5) condemns the extent of the violence used against Montagnard protesters on April 10 and 11, 2004, and the use of any violence against peaceful protests and demonstrations.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States should: (1) make the immediate release of Father Ly a top concern; (2) reiterate its deep concern regarding the violation of Father Ly's and other prisoners' human rights, and continue to urge the Government of Vietnam to comply with international standards for freedom and human rights; (3) make it clear to the Government of Vietnam that the detention and human rights violations of Father Ly and other persons create obstacles to improved bilateral relations with the United States; and (4) reiterate the deep concern of the United States regarding the continued imprisonment of Father Ly, and other persons whose human rights are being violated, and discuss their legal status and humanitarian needs with the Government of Vietnam.