Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/24/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/25/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/30/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/30/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/30/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/31/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/31/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/01/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/12/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/12/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2004