Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/18/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/18/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/18/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/18/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/18/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/25/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/25/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/30/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/30/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/27/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/27/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/04/2004