Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/31/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/31/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/31/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/31/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/31/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/17/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/03/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/13/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2004