Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 03/18/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/20/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/06/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/08/2004