Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/21/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/21/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/21/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/21/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/27/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/27/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/27/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/27/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/27/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/28/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/28/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/11/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/13/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/17/2004