Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/26/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/2004