There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Saluting the life and courage of the late Commander Lloyd "Pete" Bucher, United States Navy (retired), who commanded the U.S.S. Pueblo (AGER-2) at the time of its capture by North Korea on January 23, 1968.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/13/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7002)
04/21/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/14/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/13/2004-2:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2004-2:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7002)
09/13/2004-2:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 407.
09/13/2004-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7002-7003)
09/13/2004-2:07pmHouseMr. Akin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/25/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Total Force.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/21/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
04/21/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/21/2004 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Total Force05/25/2004 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/14/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.407. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/13/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

States that Congress: (1) salutes the life and courage of the late Commander Lloyd `Pete' Bucher, United States Navy (retired), who commanded the U.S.S. Pueblo at the time of its capture by North Korea on January 23, 1968, and who passed away on January 28, 2004; (2) praises Commander Bucher for his exemplary bravery and sacrifice, which were an inspiration to his crew and the United States, while he and his crew were held in captivity for 11 months in North Korea; (3) praises the bravery of the crew of the U.S.S. Pueblo; and (4) expresses its heartfelt sympathy to the family and friends of Commander Bucher.