Text: H.Con.Res.407 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (09/14/2004)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 407 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 407


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 14, 2004

        Received and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
  Saluting the life and courage of the late Commander Lloyd ``Pete'' 
 Bucher, United States Navy (retired), who commanded the U.S.S. Pueblo 
(AGER-2) at the time of its capture by North Korea on January 23, 1968.

Whereas on January 28, 2004, Commander Lloyd ``Pete'' Bucher, United States Navy 
        (retired), died and was subsequently buried with honors at Fort 
        Rosecrans National Cemetery in Point Loma, San Diego, California;
Whereas Lloyd Bucher was appointed as a commissioned officer in the Navy in June 
        1953 and in May 1967 was assigned command of the U.S.S. Pueblo (AGER-2), 
        an


auxiliary light cargo ship designated as an environmental research vessel;

Whereas the U.S.S. Pueblo, while under the command of Commander Bucher and in 
        international waters conducting an intelligence mission off the coast of 
        North Korea, was attacked by three North Korean torpedo boats and a 
        North Korean sub chaser on January 23, 1968;
Whereas the U.S.S. Pueblo was armed only with two .50-caliber machine guns, and 
        the attack resulted in the death of one Navy sailor and the capture of 
        Commander Bucher, his crew, and the U.S.S. Pueblo;
Whereas Commander Bucher and his crew were starved and tortured for 11 months, 
        and were repeatedly beaten, burned on steam radiators, and otherwise 
        brutally treated by their North Korean captors;
Whereas Commander Bucher bore the brunt of the wrath of the North Koreans;
Whereas crewman James Kell said, ``We were all beaten, we all were tortured. But 
        [Commander Bucher] had it double, triple, quadruple what we got.'';
Whereas crewman Stu Russell said, ``[Commander Bucher] was a giant. No matter 
        who did what, he was always punished. I simply don't know where he got 
        the strength and courage to go through what he did.'';
Whereas on December 23, 1968, the crew of the U.S.S. Pueblo was released, some 
        of whom were crippled or nearly blind because of the brutality and 
        malnourishment they endured;
Whereas Commander Bucher retired from the Navy in 1973; and
Whereas Commander Bucher is survived by his wife, Rose, their two sons, and 
        several grandchildren: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) salutes the life and courage of the late Commander 
        Lloyd ``Pete'' Bucher, United States Navy (retired), who 
        commanded the U.S.S. Pueblo (AGER-2) at the time of its capture 
        by North Korea on January 23, 1968, and who passed away on 
        January 28, 2004;
            (2) praises Commander Bucher for his exemplary bravery and 
        sacrifice, which were an inspiration to his crew and the United 
        States, while he and his crew were held in captivity for 11 
        months in North Korea;
            (3) praises the bravery of the crew of the U.S.S. Pueblo; 
        and
            (4) expresses its heartfelt sympathy to the family and 
        friends of Commander Bucher.

            Passed the House of Representatives September 13, 2004.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.