There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing with humble gratitude the more than 16,000,000 veterans who served in the United States Armed Forces during World War II and the Americans who supported the war effort on the home front and celebrating the completion of the National World War II Memorial on the National Mall in the District of Columbia.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/21/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6063-6064)
05/20/2004Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/12/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 168).(text as passed House: CR 5/11/2004 H2769-2770)
04/28/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
05/21/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/21/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6063-6064)
05/20/2004SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 520.
05/20/2004SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/20/2004SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/13/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/12/2004-6:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 168). (text as passed House: CR 5/11/2004 H2769-2770)
05/12/2004-6:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/12/2004-6:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2875-2876)
05/11/2004-5:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2004-5:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 409.
05/11/2004-5:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2769-2774)
05/11/2004-5:25pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/28/2004HouseReferred to House Resources
04/28/2004HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
04/28/2004HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/28/2004 Referred to
House Resources04/28/2004 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/13/2004 Referred to
05/20/2004 Markup by
05/20/2004 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.409.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes with humble gratitude the more than 16 million veterans who served in the U.S. Armed Forces during World War II and the Americans who supported the war effort on the home front.

Celebrates the completion of the National World War II Memorial on the National Mall in the District of Columbia.