There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 25th anniversary of the adoption of the Constitution of the Republic of the Marshall Islands and recognizing the Marshall Islands as a staunch ally of the United States, committed to principles of democracy and freedom for the Pacific region and throughout the world.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
07/12/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
07/12/2004Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7941)
07/06/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 326).(text as passed House: CR H5155-5156)
04/30/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/13/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/12/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
07/12/2004SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7941)
07/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/06/2004-6:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/06/2004-6:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 326). (text as passed House: CR H5155-5156)
07/06/2004-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5165)
07/06/2004-2:18pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/06/2004-2:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 410.
07/06/2004-2:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5155-5158)
07/06/2004-2:09pmHouseMr. Flake moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
06/16/2004HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
06/16/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/30/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
04/30/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations04/30/2004 Referred to
06/16/2004 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/07/2004 Referred to
07/12/2004 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.410.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.410. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/12/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 6, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

States that Congress: (1) recognizes the 25th anniversary of the adoption of the Constitution of the Republic of the Marshall Islands; and (2) recognizes the Republic of the Marshall Islands as a staunch ally of the United States, committed to principles of democracy and freedom for the Pacific region and throughout the world.