Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/04/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/17/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/17/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/17/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/17/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/17/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/17/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/17/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/01/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/01/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/01/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/01/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/01/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/01/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/01/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/01/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/01/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/01/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/02/2004