Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/06/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/06/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/11/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/12/2004