Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/02/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/02/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/14/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/14/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/21/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/25/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2004