Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/21/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2004