Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/09/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/17/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2004