Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/03/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/09/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/16/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2004