There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the 10 communities selected to receive the 2004 All-America City Award.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/18/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11510)
10/06/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8265)
06/23/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/19/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11510)
10/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/06/2004-5:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/2004-5:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8265)
10/06/2004-4:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 464.
10/06/2004-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8265-8268)
10/06/2004-4:50pmHouseMr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
09/15/2004HouseSubcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/15/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/15/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
07/01/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
06/23/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
06/23/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform06/23/2004 Referred to
09/15/2004 Markup by
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization07/01/2004 Referred to
09/15/2004 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.464.


Subjects (18)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/18/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the following communities on receiving the National Civic League 2004 All-America City Award: Concord, North Carolina; Evansville, Indiana; Cottage Grove, Oregon; Spokane, Washington; Springfield, Ohio; Montevideo, Minnesota; Pembroke Pines, Florida; Stockton, California; Philippi, West Virginia; and Hidalgo, Texas.