Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/09/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/09/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/13/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/13/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/13/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/13/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/13/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/13/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/13/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/13/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/14/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/14/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/14/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/19/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/19/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/19/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/20/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/20/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/20/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/21/2004