Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 07/06/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/06/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/08/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/12/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/12/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/13/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/15/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/15/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/19/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/19/2004