There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Expressing the sense of Congress that it is appropriate to annually observe Patriot Day, September 11, with voluntary acts of service and compassion.

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that the President should designate September 11 as a national day of voluntary service, charity, and compassion.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/10/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2004Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11017-11019)
09/22/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7360)
07/14/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/12/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2004SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11017-11019)
09/23/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/22/2004-2:25pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2004-2:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2004-2:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7360)
09/22/2004-2:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 473.
09/22/2004-2:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7360-7361)
09/22/2004-2:17pmHouseMr. Ose moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/14/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
07/14/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform07/14/2004 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/23/2004 Referred to
10/10/2004 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.473.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.473. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/22/2004)

Expresses the sense of Congress that it is appropriate to annually observe Patriot Day, September 11, with voluntary acts of service and compassion in honor of the lives lost on that day in 2001 in the terrorist attack on the United States and in the spirit of selflessness and unity demonstrated by those who participated in the rescue, recovery, and voluntary service activities that day.