Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/27/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/27/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 02/27/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/06/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/06/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/13/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/24/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/24/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/24/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/24/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/24/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/24/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/01/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/01/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/01/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/24/2003