Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/22/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/04/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/04/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/04/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/04/2004