Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/15/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2003