There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that States should require candidates for driver's licenses to demonstrate an ability to exercise greatly increased caution when driving in the proximity of a potentially visually impaired individual.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4659)
02/26/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/23/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/22/2004-11:15amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/22/2004-11:15amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4659)
06/22/2004-11:09amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 56.
06/22/2004-11:09amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4659-4660)
06/22/2004-11:09amHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/27/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/26/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/26/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/31/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/2003
Resident Commissioner Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/15/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/26/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines02/27/2003 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/23/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.56.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.56. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/22/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of Congress that each State should require, as a condition of obtaining a driver's license, that a candidate demonstrate an ability to associate the use of the white cane and guide dog with a visually impaired individual and to exercise increased caution when driving in proximity to a potentially visually impaired individual.