Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/31/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/15/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2004