Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/11/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/09/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/09/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2004