Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/07/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/04/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/12/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/26/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/11/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/07/2003