Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/07/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/09/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/22/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/04/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/04/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/04/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/04/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/04/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/04/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 06/04/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/09/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2004