Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/15/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/15/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/25/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/02/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/30/2003