Text: H.Con.Res.96 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Received in Senate (05/08/2003)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF.

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 96 Received in Senate (RDS)]

  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 96


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                              May 8, 2003

                                Received

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
   Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace 
                      Officers' Memorial Service.

    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring),

SECTION 1. USE OF CAPITOL GROUNDS FOR NATIONAL PEACE OFFICERS' MEMORIAL 
              SERVICE.

    (a) In General.--The National Fraternal Order of Police and its 
auxiliary (in this resolution referred to as the ``sponsor'') shall be 
permitted to sponsor a public event, the 22nd annual National Peace 
Officers' Memorial Service (in this resolution jointly referred to as 
the ``event''), on the Capitol Grounds, in order to honor the law 
enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2002.
    (b) Date of Event.--The event shall be held on May 15, 2003, or on 
such other date as the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the 
Committee on Rules and Administration of the Senate jointly designate.

SEC. 2. TERMS AND CONDITIONS.

    (a) In General.--Under conditions to be prescribed by the Architect 
of the Capitol and the Capitol Police Board, the event shall be--
            (1) free of admission charge and open to the public; and
            (2) arranged not to interfere with the needs of Congress.
    (b) Expenses and Liabilities.--The sponsor shall assume full 
responsibility for all expenses and liabilities incident to all 
activities associated with the event.

SEC. 3. EVENT PREPARATIONS.

    Subject to the approval of the Architect of the Capitol, the 
sponsor is authorized to erect upon the Capitol Grounds such stage, 
sound amplification devices, and other related structures and 
equipment, as may be required for the event.

SEC. 4. ENFORCEMENT OF RESTRICTIONS.

    The Capitol Police Board shall provide for enforcement of the 
restrictions contained in section 4 of the Act of July 31, 1946 (40 
U.S.C. 193d; 60 Stat. 718), concerning sales, advertisements, displays, 
and solicitations on the Capitol Grounds, as well as other restrictions 
applicable to the Capitol Grounds, in connection with the event.

            Passed the House of Representatives May 7, 2003.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.