Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/06/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/18/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/09/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/23/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/31/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/20/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/19/2004