Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (01/10/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was Passed by the Senate on January 9, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Amends Public Law 107-229 to extend until January 31, 2003, specified continuing appropriations for FY 2003.

(Sec. 2) Provides that funds shall be available and obligations due for mandatory payments on or about November 1, 2002, December 1, 2002, January 1, 2003, and February 1, 2003, may continue to be made for certain entitlements and other mandatory payments whose budget authority was provided in appropriations Acts for FY 2002 and for activities under the Food Stamp Act of 1977.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Treasury and General Government Appropriations Act, 2002 to extend through September 30, 2003, specified restrictions on pay increases for prevailing rate employees.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the availability of such sums as may be necessary to the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) for the Secretary of the Treasury to advance start-up expenses to the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board pursuant to the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002.

Requires the Board to reimburse the SEC for any Commission appropriations advanced to it for start-up expenses pursuant to the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002.

Repeals the current annual rate of operations for the Federal-aid highway program for FY 2003, as well as the ceiling on total obligations for the program while operating under continuing resolutions for FY 2003.

(Sec. 5) Deems approved by specified congressional committees the Prospectus Lease, Department of Homeland Security, Washington, DC Metropolitan Area of the General Services Administration.

Prohibits the General Services Administration from delegating to any other department or agency the authority to lease space for the Department of Homeland Security.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the District of Columbia to expend local funds for programs and activities under the heading "District of Columbia Funds Operating Expenses" at the rate set forth for such programs and activities in the revised financial plan and budget for the District Government for FY 2003.

Repeals certain authority to expend local funds at a rate in excess of the rate under authority applicable before October 1, 2002, to cover specified repayments of loans and interest.