There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Continuing Appropriations resolution FY2005 (Third) (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year 2005, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/03/2004Became Public Law No: 108-434. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2004Signed by President.
12/01/2004Presented to President.
11/24/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11847)
11/24/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10893)
11/24/2004Committee on Appropriations discharged.
11/24/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/03/2004Became Public Law No: 108-434. (TXT | PDF)
12/03/2004Signed by President.
12/01/2004HousePresented to President.
11/24/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/24/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11847)
11/24/2004-2:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/24/2004-2:37pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10893)
11/24/2004-2:25pmHouseRESERVATION OF OBJECTION - The House is proceeding under reservation of objection to the original request to discharge from committee and consider. Subsequently, after a period of discussion, the reservation was withdrawn.
11/24/2004-2:24pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10890-10893)
11/24/2004-2:20pmHouseMr. Wolf asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/24/2004HouseCommittee on Appropriations discharged.
11/24/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
11/24/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations11/24/2004 Referred to
11/24/2004 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.115.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-434 (12/03/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends Federal law to provide further continuing appropriations for FY 2005 until the earliest of: (1) enactment of an appropriation for any project or activity provided for in such law; (2) enactment of the applicable appropriations Act without any provision for such project or activity; or (3) December 8, 2004 (currently, December 3, 2004).