There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States regarding the right of all citizens of the United States to a public education of equal high quality.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/04/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/17/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/04/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution05/05/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.29.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.29. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/2003)

Constitutional Amendment - Provides that all U.S. citizens shall enjoy the right to a public education of equal high quality.