Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/17/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2004