Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/08/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/08/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/08/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/08/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 01/08/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/08/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/08/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/08/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/08/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 01/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/08/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/08/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/08/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/08/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/08/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 01/08/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/08/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/08/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/08/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/28/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/28/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/28/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/28/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/28/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/28/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/28/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/28/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/28/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/28/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/28/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 01/28/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/28/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/28/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/28/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 01/28/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/28/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/28/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/28/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/28/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/28/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/28/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/04/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/04/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/04/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 02/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/04/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/04/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/26/2003